Accounts and annual returns THE AORTIC CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 1174803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 09 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 10 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 10 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 11 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 11 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 11 November 2019 256 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 11 November 2019 256 days late Download Open in new window