Trustees THE BAYTREE CENTRE

Charity number: 1175145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laura Carderera Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Myuri Mahauthaman Trustee 06 May 2021
None on record
Marie-Claire Daaboul Trustee 06 May 2021
None on record
Tseday Hailu Trustee 11 March 2021
None on record
Ekenedilichukwu Olele Trustee 13 December 2018
None on record
SOPHIA MARY ALYCIA PAIN Trustee 11 November 2017
None on record