ST PAUL'S CHILDCARE

Charity number: 1175452
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carol Rushton Trustee 18 October 2021 None on record
Deborah Hartland Chair 20 May 2019 None on record
Hayley Jane Wheadon-Griffiths Trustee 15 June 2020 None on record
Rose Burrow Trustee 31 December 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S, TUPSLEY, HEREFORD Received: On time
Rev Nicholas Paul Armstrong Trustee 31 October 2017
THE BISHOP OF HEREFORD'S BLUE COAT SCHOOL CHARITY Received: On time
ST MARY'S CHURCH IMPROVEMENT FUND Overdue by 1488 days
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S, TUPSLEY, HEREFORD Received: On time
Caroline Evans Trustee 30 October 2020 None on record