Accounts and annual returns IQRAA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1175335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 31 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 31 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 29 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 29 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 13 September 2019 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 September 2019 13 days late Download Open in new window