Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY CHAPLAINS

Charity number: 1175773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 July 2020 03 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2020 03 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 July 2019 03 February 2021 249 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2019 03 February 2021 249 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 July 2018 30 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2018 30 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window