Accounts and annual returns THE DOC MARTIN FUND

Charity number: 1177280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 March 2021 261 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 08 January 2020 192 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required