Financial history ROTHERHAM SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1173826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £23.20k £30.97k £66.76k £28.74k £23.00k
Total expenditure £22.86k £20.45k £26.90k £40.83k £19.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £15.25k £15.00k