Accounts and annual returns DURHAM/NORTHUMBERLAND WING ATC WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1175149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 February 2019 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 February 2019 20 days late Download Open in new window