Dogfen lywodraethu BEECHWOOD VILLAGE COMMUNITY TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED ON 26 APR 2018 AS AMENDED ON 10 MAR 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 JUL 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY OF THE AREA FORMERLY COMMONLY KNOWN AS CRAYLANDS IN BASILDON, ESSEX INCLUDING THAT PART WHICH HAS BEEN SUBJECT TO REGENERATION AND HAS BEEN RENAMED BEECHWOOD VILLAGE IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.