FOREFRONT CHURCH

Charity number: 1176844
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 89 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 89 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 March 2021 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 March 2021 142 days late
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 January 2020 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 March 2020 125 days late