THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S WITH CHRIST CHURCH AND HOLY TRINITY, DERBY

Charity number: 1175515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carolyn Miller Trustee 31 March 2019 None on record
Dr William Poole Trustee 19 May 2019 None on record
ALBERT EDWARD CHAMBERS Trustee 09 April 2017 None on record
Elizabeth Helen Runcorn Trustee 13 June 2021 None on record
Janet Macintyre Trustee 13 June 2021 None on record
Rev Nicholas John Parish Trustee 26 July 2021 None on record
Dr Kathryn Ellis Trustee 13 June 2021 None on record
Dr NEIL WILLIAM HARVEY Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
T C BENSON Trustee 24 March 2019 None on record
Brenda French Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
LESLEY JANE KITSON Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Rev ANITA KATHRYN MATTHEWS Trustee 22 April 2005
DERBY CITY CENTRE CHAPLAINCY Received: 1 day late