Trustees FARNCOMBE DAY CENTRE LIMITED
Charity number: 1175294

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr EDWIN WILLIAM HISLOP | Chair | 21 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Barker | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Elcombe | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Grout | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Edward David Fry | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Malcolm Gammon | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Althea Elizabeth Storrier | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sameena Thompson | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.