Trustees THE FOUNDRY CHURCH

Charity number: 1174210
Charity reporting is up to date (217 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Steven Allen Greenow Chair 05 July 2017
None on record
Howard John Carruthers Kelly Trustee 21 April 2024
PENTECOSTAL RESIDENCES CHARITY
Received: On time
Lois Martha Taviner Trustee 21 March 2023
PENTECOSTAL RESIDENCES CHARITY
Received: On time
Andrew John Holland Trustee 18 January 2023
None on record
Agnes Toluwalope Majaro Trustee 28 November 2022
None on record
Kwesi Ackah Trustee 20 January 2020
None on record
Diane Daniels Trustee 05 July 2017
None on record
PHILIP MARK HOLLAND Trustee 05 July 2017
THE LIGHTHOUSE FOUNDATION
Overdue by 234 days
SEAN JOHN SMITH Trustee 05 July 2017
PENTECOSTAL RESIDENCES CHARITY
Received: On time
THE LIGHTHOUSE FOUNDATION
Overdue by 234 days