INTERNATIONAL WELFARE ALLIANCE (IWARELIEF))

Charity number: 1176950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 July 2020 18 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2020 26 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 July 2019 04 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2019 18 March 2021 292 days late Download