PRESTON AFGHAN COMMUNITY ASSOSIATION

Charity number: 1176536
Charity reporting is overdue by 441 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 76 days
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 76 days
Annual return 04 January 2020 Overdue Overdue by 441 days
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2020 Overdue Overdue by 441 days
Annual return 04 January 2019 09 November 2019 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2019 16 November 2019 12 days late Download