Trustees THE DORCAS DRESS PROJECT

Charity number: 1177034
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MELISSA RUSSON Chair 23 January 2018
None on record
Kojo Amoasi Trustee 24 November 2022
None on record
Rev Hasna Khatun Trustee 13 October 2022
None on record
Hannah Harrison Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
JENNIFER CHRISTINA DE VRIES Trustee 10 January 2017
None on record