LINCOLN COMMUNITY LARDER

Charity number: 1175176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 March 2019 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 March 2019 48 days late Download