Accounts and annual returns 44AD

Charity number: 1176519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 12 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required