Financial history Rotary Club of Southampton Solent Trust Fund

Charity number: 1174544
Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £47.97k £65.35k £43.12k £57.23k £47.15k
Total expenditure £45.30k £50.70k £57.16k £40.87k £50.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A