Accounts and annual returns THE SARASWATI SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Charity number: 1176036
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 13 March 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2019 | 13 March 2021 | 406 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2019 | 06 April 2021 | 430 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window