BISHOP WILSON'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 510826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.43k £11.85k £12.10k £12.37k £12.67k
Total expenditure £10.80k £20.17k £10.51k £13.56k £9.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A