TARTIKOV

Charity number: 1174603
Charity reporting is overdue by 157 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 157 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 157 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 March 2020 253 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 09 March 2020 253 days late Download