GIRL STATS

Charity number: 1177658
Charity reporting is up to date (20 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 November 2020 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 November 2020 20 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 April 2020 176 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 June 2020 237 days late Download