INTERCULTURAL ROOTS FOR PUBLIC HEALTH

Charity number: 1179885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 10 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 10 January 2022 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 17 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 23 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 25 September 2019 On time Download