BETLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 510948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 December 2017 On time Download