REFUGEE ACTION KINGSTON

Charity number: 1176768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 September 2019 On time Download