FLEETWOOD AND CLEVELEYS LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 511121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 02 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 26 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required