FLEETWOOD AND CLEVELEYS LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 511121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £9.61k £15.28k £6.21k £5.42k £2.61k
Total expenditure £8.88k £15.71k £6.15k £4.72k £2.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A