Trustees King's Lynn Night Shelter

Charity number: 1175645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev James Alexander Nash Trustee 04 January 2022
None on record
Paul Stephen Le Serve Trustee 19 November 2021
None on record
Susan Christine Panks Trustee 11 May 2021
None on record
Dr Peter Bolitho Coates Trustee 22 July 2020
None on record
JULIAN HALLETT Trustee 21 September 2017
None on record