Financial history THE COMMUNITY OF THE MANY NAMES OF GOD

Charity number: 511166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £520.44k £474.09k £452.10k £318.81k £411.38k
Total expenditure £447.44k £491.44k £473.05k £443.24k £454.94k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £501.65k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £902 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £748 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £17.15k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £49.58k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £447.32k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £120 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £6.50k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A