Accounts and annual returns JOHN WHEELDON PTFA

Charity number: 1176461
Charity reporting is overdue by 326 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 326 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 326 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 May 2023 320 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 August 2021 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 August 2021 407 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 03 February 2020 218 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required