Intisar Foundation

Charity number: 1182384

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Sorg Stoltzfus Trustee 08 October 2020 None on record
INTISAR SALEM AL ALI AL SABAH Chair 15 December 2017 None on record
His Excellency Christian Nakhle Trustee 15 December 2019 None on record
HANIA AHMAR Trustee 15 December 2017 None on record
MOIDUNNY ABDUL MUNEEB Trustee 16 January 2018 None on record
Karma Ekmekji Trustee 29 September 2020 None on record
KARIMA ANBAR Trustee 28 March 2018 None on record
MARIANNE AFIF KAFENA Trustee 15 December 2017 None on record