Trustees RYTON AND DISTRICT MUSICAL FESTIVAL COMMITTEE
Charity number: 511378
Charity reporting is overdue by 59 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
30 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH PEART | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Elizabeth Audrey Gladstone | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Gladstone | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carole Ann Storey | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Milne | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Moira Low | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tammy Linsell | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Clark | Trustee | 08 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Latimer | Trustee | 08 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Darren William Smith | Trustee | 22 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
JULIA LAWS | Trustee | 12 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE ASH | Trustee | 12 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Reid | Trustee | 10 June 2009 |
|
|
||||
ALISON WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN SWALLOW | Trustee |
|
||||||
TREVOR PEART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAEME WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MILDRED ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHLEEN LUCAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOAN ELTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS VAL GARDENER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN HENDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HOWARD TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOUGLAS YOUNGER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER LUCAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GAVIN YOUNGER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH DOWNIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE LANCASTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIA WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.