Trustees LANCASTER AND MORECAMBE MODEL ENGINEERING SOCIETY (2018)
Charity number: 1176818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Mark Brown | Chair | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Pearson | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Pengelly | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin John Pearson | Trustee | 11 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Livesley | Trustee | 17 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Howard McQuire | Trustee | 17 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN DIXON | Trustee | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW STEWART DUNN | Trustee | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Christopher Wood | Trustee | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
BEVIS MULHOLLAND | Trustee | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JAMES WILSON | Trustee | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.