Trustees WARRINGTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 511469
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Frances Ireland Trustee 16 April 2019
None on record
Alan Gough Trustee 04 July 2018
None on record
Cllr Diana Friend Trustee 22 May 2018
PADGATE YOUTH CLUB
Received: On time
ROOM AT THE INN AND THE 'Y' PROJECT
Received: On time
Rev Shirley Cowan Trustee 12 April 2018
None on record
Rev June Lesley Steventon Trustee 02 January 2018
WINWICK PARISH CHARITY
Overdue by 431 days
THE WINWICK EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Overdue by 220 days
Dr CARSTEN KRESSEL Trustee 30 March 2017
None on record
Edward Collinson Trustee 13 April 2016
CHRIST CHURCH PADGATE PCC
Received: On time
Veronica Prowting Trustee 20 September 2014
None on record
NEIL FAIRWEATHER Trustee 16 September 2013
None on record
PETER SIMPSON SPEED Trustee
FAIRFIELD AND HOWLEY NEIGHBOURHOOD PROJECT
Received: On time
THE LITTLE LOT LIMITED
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST THOMAS' AND ST MARY MAGDALENE STOCKTON HEATH, CHESHIRE
Received: On time
JILL HODGSON Trustee
STRETTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
JOHN DAVID BYGATE Trustee
None on record
ROGER HILL BINGHAM Trustee
None on record
STUART MCGREGOR HARRISON Trustee
None on record