Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST. JAMES WITH CHRISTCHURCH AND ST. CRISPIN, BERMONDSEY
Charity number: 1176709
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PENNY MOLYNEUX | Chair | 25 April 2003 |
|
|
||||||
MARGARET MARIAN GREENWOOD | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Sexton | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rebecca Elizabeth Hilton | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Inocentia Novo | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
David Terence Chavannes-Tozer | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Tim McNally | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sukisa Mayanja | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Mamta Solomon | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Kasule | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Cathrine Jane Squelch | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Claire Esther Mayne-Constantinou | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Sir SIMON HENRY WARD HUGHES | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
PATRICIA O'CONNOR | Trustee | 22 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
CAPT PAUL JONATHAN WARREN | Trustee | 22 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Adrian Greenwood | Trustee | 10 October 2000 |
|
|||||||
JEAN EMILY KATHLEEN MCCORRY | Trustee | 24 April 1993 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.