Sight Support West of England

Charity number: 1178384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amar Shah Trustee 22 February 2019 None on record
Carl Hall Trustee 18 December 2017
WILTSHIRE BLIND ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Nicholas Grinham Chair 18 December 2017
WILTSHIRE BLIND ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Lauren Jane Williams Trustee 24 September 2019 None on record
Heather Armstrong Trustee 27 March 2020 None on record
Simon Williams Trustee 01 April 2021
WILTSHIRE BLIND ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Rachel Farr Trustee 01 April 2021 None on record
Simon John Russell Trustee 31 May 2019 None on record