Accounts and annual returns WESTBURY AWESOME ARCHERY

Charity number: 1178787
Charity reporting is overdue by 1153 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 57 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 57 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 422 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 422 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 July 2021 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 787 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 July 2021 524 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1153 days