Accounts and annual returns APOSTOLIC CHURCH INTERNATIONAL FELLOWSHIP (ACIF)

Charity number: 1179005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 03 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 03 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 02 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 02 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 02 June 2020 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 02 June 2020 118 days late Download Open in new window