Trustees THE RIVER WEY TRUST
Charity number: 1177871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANGELA BETTY LANGTON GLASS | Chair | 03 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Sally Ann Cameron | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debra Curnow-Ford | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Richard Camin Carne | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Iain James Belcher | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Wood | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Kavanagh | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
SIMON BLEACH | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL CROUCHER | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|||||
ROGER JAMES MILLER | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alistair John Young | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Harris | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Charlotte Bird | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JOHN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.