FUSION SOUTH KERRIER

Charity number: 1179220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download