Trustees ADUR EAST LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Charity number: 1177392
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Sluys | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claudine Rogers | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frances Burt | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pearl Boyce | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Burchell | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
COLIN ALBERT BURT | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CHRISTOPHER BEHLING | Trustee | 01 July 2010 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.