Accounts and annual returns ANWAR SULTANA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1179265
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2021 01 April 2022 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 01 April 2022 59 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2020 01 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 01 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2019 21 October 2020 263 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 October 2020 264 days late Download Open in new window