Accounts and annual returns NASSERPURIA MEMON UK

Charity number: 1178851
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window