THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN BURES

Charity number: 1183767
Charity reporting is overdue by 35 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KATHERINE FIONA BUCKLE Trustee 07 March 2019 None on record
SUSAN EVELENE RYMAN Trustee 31 January 2019 None on record
MURRAY CHARLES EMERSON Trustee 07 March 2019 None on record
LYNDA KATHLEEN LEE Trustee 31 January 2019 None on record
REV STEPHEN RAYMOND MORLEY Chair 22 July 2014 None on record
SYLVIA GASPAR Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
ANDREW DAVID CLIFFT Trustee 31 January 2019 None on record
MARTIN NORMAN RANDALL Trustee 07 March 2019 None on record
CHARLOTTE CATHERINE SCOTT Trustee 31 January 2019 None on record
PAUl DOMINIC WHITE Trustee 31 January 2019 None on record
CHRISTINE ALEXANDRA MARY TOMKINSON Trustee 31 January 2019 None on record
JAY JULIA DAWN SARGEANT Trustee 31 January 2019 None on record
ALAN RYMAN Trustee 01 January 2006
BURES COMMON LAND Received: On time
THE GREAT ROPER'S CHARITY Received: On time
DAVID SIDNEY LEE Trustee 31 January 2019
THE GREAT ROPER'S CHARITY Received: On time
ANDREA DAWN CARTER Trustee 07 March 2019 None on record
JENNIFER MARY DAVIS Trustee 31 January 2019 None on record
MAJOR RICHARD CHARLES GOULD Trustee 01 March 2018
THE ESSEX REGIMENT MUSEUM Received: On time
MOUNT BURES VILLAGE HALL Recently registered
MOUNT BURES VILLAGE HALL Overdue by 35 days
Rev MARY JACQUELINE CANTACUZENE Trustee 12 March 2019 None on record
DEREK WOLSTEN-CROFT Trustee 31 January 2019
BURES COMMUNITY CENTRE Received: On time