Accounts and annual returns TAMIL MUSLIM COMMUNITY BIRMINGHAM

Charity number: 1177352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 January 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 January 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 January 2024 355 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 January 2024 355 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2024 720 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 January 2024 720 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 January 2024 1086 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 January 2024 1086 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1600 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1600 days