Accounts and annual returns SOUTH EAST DERBYSHIRE MUSIC CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 1180960
Charity reporting is up to date (209 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 January 2024 209 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 25 January 2024 209 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 01 August 2022 32 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 03 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window