Accounts and annual returns HR LIBA LTD
Charity number: 1179451

Charity reporting is overdue by 413 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 48 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 48 days | |
Annual return | 20 June 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 413 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 June 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 413 days | |
Annual return | 20 June 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 June 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 June 2019 | 11 April 2021 | 356 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 June 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window