THREE COUNTIES AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 511868
Charity reporting is up to date (126 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 03 February 2021 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 03 February 2021 126 days late Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 21 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 22 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 30 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 29 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 12 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2015 18 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2015 12 May 2016 On time Download