Accounts and annual returns THE BRAMPTON PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 511885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 25 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 13 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 10 September 2020 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 04 March 2020 186 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 09 September 2018 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required